IL SB0186 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purpose of purchasing acoustical materials, other materials, labor, and professional services to soundproof a residential home located at an eligible address against aircraft noise generated by an airport governed by the provisions of the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero; however, the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SOUNDPROOFING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=186&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0186.htm |