IL SB0182 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall study the feasibility of creating a statewide registry of advance directives and Practitioner Order for Life-Sustaining Treatment forms. Amends the Illinois Living Will Act, the Health Care Surrogate Act, the Mental Health Treatment Preferences Declaration Act, and the Powers of Attorney for Health Care Law of the Illinois Power of Attorney Act. Provides that various types of documents may be in hard copy or electronic format. Provides that electronic declarations may be revoked, among other things, by deletion in a manner indicating the intention to revoke and in a manner that meets the requirements for a deletion by a provider deleting an entry in the electronic medical record. Provides that signature and execution requirements are satisfied by written signatures or initials and electronic signatures or computer-generated signature codes that meet the requirements for a signature by a provider making an entry into the electronic medical record. Provides that a person who enters information in an electronic system under the persona of the principal shall be held civilly liable. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ESTATES-HEALTH DIRECTIVES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0163
2019-07-26SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-26SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-001-000
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-05-08HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000
2019-05-01HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-04-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 010-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-600Amended CodeCitation Text
755352Amended CodeCitation Text
755355Amended CodeCitation Text
755359Amended CodeCitation Text
7554070New CodeSee Bill Text
7554320Amended CodeCitation Text
7554323New CodeSee Bill Text
755435Amended CodeCitation Text
7554350Amended CodeCitation Text
755454-10Amended CodeCitation Text
755454-4Amended CodeCitation Text
755454-4.1New CodeSee Bill Text
755454-6Amended CodeCitation Text
755454-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback