IL SB0177 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides requirements concerning disclosure and review of prior authorization requirements, denial of claims or coverage by a utilization review organization, and the implementation of prior authorization requirements or restrictions. Provides requirements concerning a utilization review organization's obligations with respect to prior authorizations in nonurgent circumstances, urgent health care services, and emergency health care services. Provides that a utilization review organization shall not require prior authorization under specified circumstances. Provides requirements concerning the length of prior authorizations. Provides that health care services are automatically deemed authorized if a utilization review organization fails to comply with the requirements of the Act. Provides that the Director of Insurance may impose an administrative fine not to exceed $250,000 for violations of the Act. Defines terms. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to change the definition of "emergency medical condition". Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act to provide that companies that transact accident and health insurance shall comply with specified requirements of the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to provide that all managed care organizations shall comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
PRIOR AUTHORIZATION REFORM ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 134 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 134 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 370g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12d | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=177&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0177.htm |