IL SB0177 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received motor fuel tax distributions totaling more than $1,000,000 in the previous State fiscal year shall receive a future distribution of motor fuel tax moneys unless that municipality, county, or road district implements a business enterprise program setting goals for the inclusion of minority, veteran, and female-owned businesses in the procurement of contracts. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall assist municipalities, counties, and road districts in implementing those programs. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR FUEL-LOCAL GOV DBE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-010-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harris
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-003-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-005-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Transportation
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-615New CodeSee Bill Text
355058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback