IL SB0172 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that when a person commits a battery and knows the individual harmed to be an individual under 14 years of age, the offense is enhanced to aggravated battery. Provides that this provision shall not be construed to prohibit a parent, guardian, or legal custodian of the individual harmed from exercising reasonable discipline over the individual under 14 years of age. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-AGG BATTERY-AGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-26 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-02-19 | Held in Criminal Law | |
2009-02-11 | Held in Criminal Law | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=172&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0172.htm |