IL SB0166 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Modifies provisions concerning the powers and duties of the Commission on Equity and Inclusion to specify that its powers relate to procurements and contracts for the purpose of diversity, equity, and inclusion. Further modifies powers and duties of the Commission concerning the review of proposals, bids, or contracts, and the issuance of recommendations. Modifies provisions concerning competitive sealed bidding and proposals to make changes concerning the award of contracts and methods of scoring. Requires the chief procurement officer to adopt rules regarding the use of contractors certified in the Business Enterprise Program in emergency and quick purchase procurements. Provides that if a State agency determines that a vendor made good faith efforts towards meeting contract goals, the agency may issue a waiver after concurrence by the chief procurement officer. Provides for the joint review and objection of a proposed lease procurement by the Procurement Policy Board and the Commission on Equity and Inclusion. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides for the transfer of the various functions, powers, and duties of the Department of Central Management Services regarding the Business Enterprise Program to the Commission on Equity and Inclusion. Makes changes concerning requirements for the awarding of State contracts under the Act, requests for and granting of waivers under the Act, and enforcement of the Act with remedies and sanctions. Changes the effective date of certain provisions of Public Act 101-657. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED SAVINGS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0029 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-017-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 036-017-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-042-001 |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 014-000-000 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |