IL SB0158 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for a municipality with a population over 100,000, all property owned by the municipality, or property interests or rights held by the municipality, regardless of whether such property, interests, or rights are, in whole or in part, within or without its corporate limits, that is used for toll road or toll bridge purposes and that is leased or licensed for those purposes to another entity whose property or property interests or rights are not exempt shall remain exempt, and any leasehold interest in such property, interest, or rights shall not be subject to property taxes. Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Authority shall have power to enter into an intergovernmental agreement or contract with a unit of local government or other public or private entity for a private bridge operator's collection, enforcement, and administration of tolls, violations, fees, fines, charges, and penalties in connection with a bridge authorized under the Toll Bridge Act. Amends the Toll Bridge Act. Provides that county boards may fix toll rates by establishing a toll rate schedule setting a maximum toll rate. Provides that a private operator may enter into an agreement with the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to provide electronic toll collection or toll violation enforcement services. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Prescribes processes by which private and public tolling entities shall report violations to the Secretary of State. Provides that the Secretary of State may suspend a person's driver's license for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations. Prescribes process for the suspension of a driver's license due to tolling violations. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SALES IN ERROR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0398 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-029-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-003-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |