IL SB0155 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Redefines "physical or mental condition that typically results in developmental delay" to mean a diagnosed medical disorder bearing a relatively well known expectancy for developmental outcomes within varying ranges of developmental disabilities, including elevated blood lead levels, as defined by the Department of Public Health by rule, confirmed by a venous blood test (rather than a diagnosed medical disorder bearing a relatively well known expectancy for developmental outcomes within varying ranges of developmental disabilities).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY INVENTION-DEFINED TERM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2019-03-19SenateReported Back To Human Services; 003-000-000
2019-03-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback