IL SB0153 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in a prosecution of a case involving the injury, health, or safety of a cat or dog, the court may, on its own motion or motion of any party, appoint a licensed attorney-at-law of the State or a law student as a special advocate to assist the court, as deemed appropriate by the court, and represent the interests of justice regarding the health or safety of the cat or dog. Provides that the advocate may: (1) monitor the case; (2) consult any person with information that could aid the court and review records relating to the condition of the cat or dog and the defendant's actions, including, but not limited to, records from animal control officers, veterinarians, and police officers; (3) attend hearings; and (4) present information or recommendations to the court pertinent to determinations that relate to the interests of justice, provided that information shall be based solely on the duties undertaken under this provision. Defines "law student".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-SPECIAL ADVOCATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-009-000
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-12HouseRemains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-12HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-008-001
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-28HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-04-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-010-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
2021-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-03-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-002-000
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2021
2021-03-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
2021-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-02-17SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255113A-1New CodeSee Bill Text
7255Art. 113A headinNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback