IL SB0148 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. With regard to local school council members, provides that the school district shall perform a check of the Dru Sjodin National Sex Offender Public Website, the Statewide Sex Offender Database, and the Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database upon the election or appointment of a local school council member. Provides that if the general superintendent determines at any time that a local school council member or member-elect appears on the Dru Sjodin National Sex Offender Public Website or the Statewide Sex Offender Database or Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database, the general superintendent must notify the local school council member or member-elect of such determination and the local school council member or member-elect must be removed from the local school council by the board of education. Provides that a local school council member must comply with all applicable board rules and policies regarding employees or volunteers. Removes provisions regarding ineligibility for election or appointment of a local school council member based upon certain criminal convictions. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL COUNCIL-OFFENDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-004-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Human Rights; 006-003-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees Human Rights, Education |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |