IL SB0142 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide that in the case of sexual assault or sexual abuse by a school district employee or volunteer, nothing in the Act prohibits a school district from disclosing the disciplinary records of that person. Amends the School Code to require a school board to report all credible cases of sexual assault or sexual abuse by a licensed educator to the State Board of Education, to establish a hearing procedure for student victims, and to ensure that a licensed educator under investigation by the State Superintendent of Education is reassigned to non-classroom duty. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, the State Board of Education must monitor all fingerprint-based criminal history records checks and any other database checks conducted by a school district or regional superintendent for applicants for employment with a school district. Makes changes concerning educator licensure and allegations of physical or sexual abuse. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to create the criminal offense of sexual conduct or sexual relations with a student by an authority figure. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to require an arresting enforcement agency to share its reports pertaining to the arrest of a licensed educator with the superintendent of any school district that employs the educator (or, in the case of the arrest of a superintendent, with the school board of any school district that employs the superintendent). Amends the Personnel Record Review Act to provide that the Act does not prohibit a school district from divulging internal investigative findings and discipline to another school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT/ABUSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Education
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-02-06SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-21.9Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-30New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-15Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-80Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.61New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-84bAmended CodeCitation Text
51407.7New CodeSee Bill Text
720511-9.6New CodeSee Bill Text
7255107-17New CodeSee Bill Text
820407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback