IL SB0139 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that upon completion of an affidavit provided by the county clerk, a person, still currently married, may request a certificate of the person's current marriage free of any gender identifying language. Provides that the request shall not permanently change the gender identifying language in the clerk's records, and the affidavit and issuance shall be kept in the permanent records of the clerk. Provides that if 2 parties currently married request a marriage certificate with gender identifiers changed, both parties shall appear before the clerk, indicate consent, and complete an affidavit. Provides that if a county provides a certified record, photocopy, or reproduction of an original record in lieu of a summary data sheet, the county clerk shall work with the Department of Public Health to develop a new certificate that can be issued in lieu of a reproduction of the prior record. Provides that when a clerk issues a nongendered marriage certificate, the certificate shall not include any language indicating it has been amended nor that it is not a true and accurate record of the facts stated therein.
Title
IMDMA-MARRIAGE CERTIFICATES
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 30 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0171 |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-030-001 |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-002-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-013-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feigenholtz |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-001-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |