IL SB0139 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Limits the situations when a person could dock an animal's tail or crop its ears without violating the Act's prohibition against "animal torture". Establishes that the following is not "animal torture": (i) tail docking performed by an Illinois licensed veterinarian for a medical reason (now, just "tail docking") or (ii) ear cropping performed by an Illinois licensed veterinarian for a medical reason (now, just "ear cropping"). Effective immediately.
Title
HUMANE CARE FOR ANIMALS-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Held in Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 006-004-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-03-05 | Held in Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-25 | Held in Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-18 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=139&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0139.htm |