IL SB0135 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a sheriff shall enter upon the duties of his or her office on the December 1 following his or her election (rather than on the first day in the month of December following his or her election on which the office of the sheriff is required, by statute or by action of the county board, to be open).
Title
SHERIFF-COMMENCEMENT OF DUTIES
Sponsors
Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-6002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |