IL SB0132 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Jail Act. Provides that if the court orders a person who is incarcerated in the county jail placed in the custody of the Department of Human Services for mental health treatment, and the Department of Human Services does not find bed space for that person in a Department of Human Services mental health facility within 30 days after the sheriff notifies the Department of Human Services of the court order, then the State shall reimburse the county where the jail is holding the person for the costs of maintaining the person beyond the 30-day period after notification. Provides to which persons incarcerated in a county jail the provision is applicable.
Title
COUNTY JAIL-DHS REIMBURSE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-04-07 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees Behavioral and Mental Health Committee, Appropriations- Human Services Subcommittee. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 125 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=132&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0132.htm |