IL SB0132 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nurse Practice Act and the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to adopt rules to include implicit bias training in the continuing education requirements for licensees under the Acts. Defines "implicit bias". Effectively immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL IMPLICIT BIAS TRAINING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-11-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256020Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2256555-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-60Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback