IL SB0130 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from January 1, 2022 to January 1, 2032. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL PRACTICE ACT-SUNSET
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=130&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0130.htm |