IL SB0115 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Modifies a Section concerning moneys in the Audit Expense Fund to provide for the transfer of moneys from specified funds into the Audit Expense Fund. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-AUDIT EXPENSE FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Public Health
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 002-010-000
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Waive Posting Notice On Motion
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-11-12SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-11-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-11-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 12, 2019
2019-11-04SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-10-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-035-000
2019-10-30House3/5 Vote Required
2019-10-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-10-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-10-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 018-000-000
2019-10-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2019-10-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
2019-10-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2019
2019-02-07SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301056z-27Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback