IL SB0112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Secretary of State for its FY 18 ordinary and contingent expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SECRETARY OF STATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback