IL SB0109 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Health Care Surrogate Act. Changes certain uses of the term "qualified physician" to "qualified health care practitioner". Provides that execution of a POLST form shall not be a requirement for admission to any facility or a precondition to the provision of services by any provider of health care services. Provides that an individual may revoke a document directing that resuscitating efforts shall not be implemented. In a Section regarding Department of Public Health Uniform POLST forms, changes the definition of "attending health care practitioner". Provides that a health care provider facility shall comply with a POLST form, National POLST form, another state's POLST Paradigm portable medical orders form, or an out-of-hospital Do Not Resuscitate (DNR) order sanctioned by a State in the United States that: has been executed by an adult; and is apparent and immediately available. Provides that before voiding or revoking a uniform practitioner orders for life-sustaining treatment (POLST) form, National POLST form, or another state's POLST Paradigm portable medical orders form consented to by the individual, that individual's legally authorized surrogate decision maker shall first: engage in consultation with the attending health care practitioner; consult the patient's advance directive, if available; and make a good faith effort to act consistently, at all times, with the patient's known wishes, or, if the patient's wishes are not known, using substituted judgment as the standard. Provides that when an individual's legally authorized surrogate is making a good faith effort to act consistently with the patient's known wishes to void or revoke a POLST form, if the patient's wishes are unknown and remain unknown after reasonable efforts to discern them, the decision shall be made on the basis of the patient's best interests as determined by the surrogate decision maker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH SURROGATE-POLST CHANGES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0140
2021-07-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-23SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-17SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-048-000
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-015-000
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feigenholtz
2021-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-001-000
2021-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
2021-03-16SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-02-17SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7554010Amended CodeCitation Text
7554020Amended CodeCitation Text
7554065Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback