IL SB0107 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon 300 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the Department of State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-ASSAULT WEAPON BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-01-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback