IL SB0105 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: In a provision concerning clinical experience for an advanced practice registered nurse, provides that completion of the clinical experience must be attested to by the collaborating physician or physicians or employer (rather than the collaborating physician or physicians) and the advanced practice registered nurse. Provides that if the collaborating physician or physicians or employer is unable to attest to the completion of the clinical experience, the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may accept other evidence of clinical experience as established by rule. Restores language concerning prescribing benzodiazepines or Schedule II narcotic drugs that was stricken in the introduced bill.
Title
APRN FULL PRACTICE AUTHORITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0075 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 65-43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |