IL SB0097 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Conversion and Formation of School Districts Article of the School Code. Within 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, requires elementary school districts to form new school districts but only with other elementary school districts and high school districts to form new school districts but only with other high school districts, notwithstanding any referendum requirements or any other laws to the contrary. Provides that the State Board of Education shall facilitate the creation of the new school districts by providing recommendations on which districts must consolidate. Sets forth the factors that the State Board must take into consideration. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CONSOLIDATE DISTRICTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
2023-03-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
2023-02-16SenateTo Executive Subcommittee on Consolidation
2023-01-31SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2023-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105511E-132New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback