IL SB0097 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides requirements concerning electronic notarization and electronic notaries public. Amends the Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act. Provides that a paper or tangible copy of an electronic document that a notary public has certified to be a true and correct copy satisfies specified recording requirements. Provides further requirements concerning the certification of electronic documents by notaries public. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2022, or upon the adoption by the Secretary of State of rules necessary for implementation, whichever is later.
Title
ELECTRONIC NOTARY PUBLIC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 1-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 1-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-102.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-102.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 2-102.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 2-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 2-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-101.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 3-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 3-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 4-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 5-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 5-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 6A-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | 7-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 7-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 7-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 7-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 312 | Art. VI-A headin | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 33 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 33 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=97&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0097.htm |