IL SB0097 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Requires all persons who must file a statement of economic interests to disclose the name of any immediate family member who is a registered lobbyist. Defines "immediate family member" as a spouse, parent, child, stepchild, adopted child, son-in-law, daughter-in-law, father-in-law, mother-in-law, brother, sister, brother-in-law, sister-in-law, grandparent, or grandchild.
Title
ST ETHICS-FAMILY MEMBER-LOBBY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=97&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0097.htm |