IL SB0095 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no legislator may negotiate for employment with a lobbying entity that engages in lobbying with members of the General Assembly during the legislator's term of office. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a member may not, within a period of one year immediately after termination of the member's most recent term of office, engage in lobbying with members of the General Assembly, if the member accepts compensation specifically attributable to that lobbying.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-MEMBER LOBBYING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-07SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54202-115New CodeSee Bill Text
54305-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback