IL SB0090 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, as amended by House Amendment No. 1, with the following changes: Provides that the county and municipality (rather than only the county) in which the drainage district lies has the authority to continue to collect, receive, and expend the proceeds of the assessment within the boundaries of the former drainage district in a proportionate share to the area of the dissolved drainage district contained within the county or municipality. Makes conforming changes.
Title
DRAINAGE DISTRICTS-DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0298 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-001-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-001-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 087-025-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 013-003-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-009-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |