IL SB0087 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2016 taxable year and thereafter, the exemption for veterans with disabilities carries over to the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year. Provides that, for the 2015 taxable year and thereafter, the exemption for veterans with disabilities carries over to the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain the exemption before death, but who would have qualified for the exemption in the current taxable year if he or she had survived. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-01-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback