IL SB0085 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that any procurement by a board of trustees involving the acquisition, by direct or beneficial ownership, of improvements to real estate by a fire protection district which results in an expenditure of district funds in excess of $20,000 must be competitively bid.
Title
FIRE DIST-COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Sponsors
Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0138 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 11k | Amended Code | Citation Text |