IL SB0085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Defines "title-secured loan". Provides that for title-secured loans entered into or renewed on or after the effective date of the Act: (i) a licensee shall not contract for or receive a charge exceeding 36% annual percentage rate on the unpaid balance of the amount financed for a title-secured loan; (ii) the loan contract shall provide for repayment of the principal and charges within specified maximum loan terms; (iii) upon or after default, a licensee shall not charge a borrower any finance charges, interest, fees, or charges of any kind; and (iv) the loan may be refinanced if the original principal of the loan has been reduced by at least 60%. Provides that nothing in these provisions abrogates a borrower's right to collect any surplus arising from the sale of a motor vehicle under the Uniform Commercial Code.
Title
TITLE-SECURED LOANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 670 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 670 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 670 | 15f | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=85&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0085.htm |