IL SB0080 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that, in a case regarding temporary guardianship, if no limited or plenary guardian has been appointed in a case regarding temporary guardianship, the court may grant an extension up to an additional 60 days or until a limited or plenary guardian has been appointed. Provides that the court may appoint separate individuals or entities or co-guardians to act as the guardian of the person and the guardian of the estate of a person with a disability under certain circumstances. Provides that a guardian is entitled to reasonable and appropriate fees, if certain conditions are met. Provides that fees awarded to a guardian shall be considered as a first-class claim for administrative expenses and paid from the guardianship estate from the decedent's estate. Adds procedures regarding the succession of a new public guardian. Makes formatting changes in Sections concerning: definitions; statutory forms; short-term guardians; preliminary hearings; domestic violence orders of protection; sterilization of the ward; and notice of rights of the ward. Changes references to "best interest" to "best interests". Amends the Illinois Power of Attorney Act. Provides that if an agent seeks guardianship of the principal, the petition for guardianship must delineate the specific powers to be granted to the guardian that are not already included in the power of attorney.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE ACT-ADULT GUARDIANSHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0072
2021-07-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-09SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-17SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-012-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-002-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Tracy
2021-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-04-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 16, 2021
2021-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2021
2021-03-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-02-09SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755452-10Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-1Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-10Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-10.1Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-12Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-13.5New CodeSee Bill Text
755511a-17Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-17.1Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-18Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-18.3Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-19Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-20Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-3Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-4Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
755511a-8Amended CodeCitation Text
755513-1Amended CodeCitation Text
755518-10Amended CodeCitation Text
755519-2Amended CodeCitation Text
755525-4Amended CodeCitation Text
755527-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback