IL SB0078 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Public Trust in Funding Responsibility Act. Prohibits a State agency from contracting with or making a grant to any entity that performs abortions or maintains or operates a facility where abortions are performed that involves the expenditure of State funds. Defines "State funds" as funds obtained through State taxation, fees, or assessments and provides that "State funds" does not include funds obtained from the federal government, federal funds administered or granted through a State agency, or State funds the expenditure of which is required by federal law. Exempts from the prohibition funding to hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers licensed under State law. Provides that the Act only applies to contracts and grants entered into, and the renewal of contracts entered into, on or after the effective date of the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FUNDING RESPONSIBILITY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-02-16SenateHeld in Public Health
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-12SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback