IL SB0074 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall adopt no rule requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation authorized under specified provisions. Provides that any existing rule, as of the effective date of the amendatory Act, requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation is void. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-LEC DUTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-07SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback