IL SB0074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, each applicant for the issuance or renewal of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall include a full set of his or her fingerprints in electronic format to the Department of State Police for the purpose of identity verification. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a license application shall contain a full set of fingerprints submitted to the Department in electronic format for the purpose of verification of identity (rather than a license application shall contain a full set of fingerprints submitted to the Department in electronic format provided the Department may accept an application submitted without a set of fingerprints in which case the Department shall be granted 30 days in addition to the 90 days period to issue or deny a license).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARMS-FINGERPRINTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-12SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430654Amended CodeCitation Text
4306630Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback