IL SB0073 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from: (i) screening job applicants based on their wage or salary history, (ii) requiring that an applicant's prior wages satisfy minimum or maximum criteria, and (iii) requesting or requiring as a condition of being interviewed or as a condition of continuing to be considered for an offer of employment that an applicant disclose prior wages or salary. Prohibits an employer from seeking the salary, including benefits or other compensation or salary history, of a job applicant from any current or former employer, with some exceptions. Limits defenses. Provides for penalties and injunctive relief. Effective 60 days after becoming law.
Title
EQUAL PAY ACT-WAGE HISTORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0073.htm |