IL SB0073 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Removes references to a written collaborative agreement throughout the Act. Provides that an advanced practice nurse's scope of practice includes collaboration and consultation with or referral to a physician or other appropriate health-care professional for patient care needs that exceed the APN's scope of practice, education, or experience. Provides that as part of the professional scope of advanced practice nursing, an advanced practice nurse possesses prescriptive authority appropriate to his or her specialty, scope of practice, education, and experience. Such prescriptive authority shall include the authority to prescribe, select, order, administer, store, accept samples of, and dispense over-the-counter medications, legend drugs, medical gases, certain controlled substances, and other preparations, including botanical and herbal remedies. Amends various other Acts to make related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSE-COLLABORATION-PRESCRIBE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB0073.htm |