IL SB0071 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides a tax credit to each taxpayer who owns qualified real property located in a county in Illinois that was declared a State disaster area by the Governor due to tornadoes in 2018. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-NATURAL DISASTER
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |