IL SB0070 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the act by a manufacturer of directly or indirectly offering or providing coupons to consumers that are redeemable at or through a retailer or third-party agent does not constitute a violation under the Act if certain conditions are met. Provides that a coupon may require the purchase of one alcoholic liquor product to obtain a full or partial discount on a separate alcoholic liquor product; may be offered as part of a retailer loyalty program or awards program; may include nonalcoholic products; and may be offered by a manufacturer to a consumer for a discount on a purchase from a licensed on-premise or off-premise retailer. Provides that on and after January 1, 2024, manufacturers shall not offer paper coupons that require a consumer to present the paper coupon to the retailer at the time of purchase to obtain the discount. Contains provisions concerning definitions; consumer promotions; notice of consumer promotions to the Illinois Liquor Control Commission; recordkeeping; State Commission enforcement of policies, rules, or statements of general applicability; and other provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-COUPONS & PROMOTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Liquor
2023-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2023-01-31SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-01-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-01-20SenateFirst Reading
2023-01-20SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-40New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback