IL SB0069 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2023 registration year, the Secretary of State, at the option of the applicant, shall issue permanent registration plates for a one-time fee of $118 to the owner of a trailer having a gross weight of 3,000 pounds or less. Provides that a person who has been issued a permanent trailer plate is not required to pay the annual flat weight tax and registration fee. Lowers the annual flat weight tax and registration fee for trailers with a gross weight of 3,000 pounds or less from $118 to $18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-PERMANENT TRAILER PLATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-808.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-819Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback