IL SB0067 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Collaborative Process Act. Defines terms. Provides that the Act applies to collaborative process participation agreements that meet the requirements of the Act signed on or after the effective date of the Act. Contains provisions concerning: requirements of collaborative process participation agreements; the beginning and conclusion of the collaborative process; proceedings before the court; disclosure of information; standards of professional responsibility and mandatory reporting; confidentiality; and privileges. Provides that the Act is subject to the supervisory authority of the Illinois Supreme Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLABORATIVE PROCESS ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0205
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-23SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-29HouseArrived in House
2017-03-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback