IL SB0065 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Calendar Total Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Title Insurance Act. Provides that in a transaction for the sale and purchase of residential real property, all title insurance policies for that transaction shall be issued through the same policy issuing entity, except as otherwise agreed by the seller and buyer. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TITLE INS-MULTIPLE POLICIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-11-14HouseArrived in House
2018-11-14SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-015-003
2018-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-13SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-23SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-014-003
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-003-001
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2018-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-044-001
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-002-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-006-003
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Hastings
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-002-001
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateRe-assigned to Judiciary
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-001
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-002-002
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151558.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=65&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0065ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0065_04262018_065000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0065_05242018_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0065ham001_05302018_012000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0065_11142018_009000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback