IL SB0064 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Religious Freedom Defense Act. Prohibits the State and local governments from taking discriminatory action against a person if the person believes or acts under a religious belief or moral conviction that marriage is only between one man and one woman, or that sexual relations are properly reserved to such a marriage. Allows a person to assert a claim or defense under the Act in a judicial or administrative proceeding for damages, injunctive relief, declaratory relief, or other appropriate relief against the State or local government. Also allows the Attorney General to seek enforcement of the Act. Defines "discriminatory action", "person", "State benefit program", and "State".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RELIGIOUS FREEDOM DEFENSE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2017-01-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback