IL SB0064 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a person who causes a fatal accident by operating a motor vehicle, all-terrain vehicle, snowmobile, or watercraft while he or she is aware of being fatigued is guilty of reckless homicide. Provides that a person is fatigued if he or she has been without sleep for 24 consecutive hours. Provides that proof that the defendant fell asleep while driving or was driving after having been without sleep for a period in excess of 24 consecutive hours may give rise to an inference that the defendant was driving recklessly. Provides that, if a person commits reckless homicide and is determined to have been knowingly fatigued as an element of the offense, he or she is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Provides that the offender, if sentenced to imprisonment, shall be sentenced to a term of not less than 3 years and not more than 14 years if the offense resulted in the death of one person or not less than 6 years and not more than 28 years if the offense resulted in the deaths of 2 or more persons.
Title
CRIM CD-RECKLESS HOMICIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Criminal Law; Subcommittee on Enhancement and Redundancy | |
2009-03-05 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Enhancements and Redundancy | |
2009-02-26 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-02-19 | Held in Criminal Law | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=64&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0064.htm |