IL SB0063 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0076
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0076
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Changes the composition of the State Rehabilitation Council. Authorizes the Governor, by executive order, to delegate to the Council his authority to make Council appointments. Makes changes in provisions concerning the terms of persons appointed to the Council. Authorizes members of the Council who are serving on the effective date of the amendatory Act to continue their service on the Council until their terms expire. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE REHABILITATION COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0076 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2013 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 14, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 5-550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 6.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |