IL SB0063 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compensation Review Act. Requires the Compensation Review Board to vote separately on compensation for judges and to file separate reports for (i) judges and (ii) all other positions. Requires that the General Assembly may disapprove a report only by a resolution and vote separate from a resolution and vote, if any, disapproving the other report.
Title
COMP REVIEW-SEPARATE REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass Executive; 008-004-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |