IL SB0061 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts to reinstate certain fees to the levels prior to Public Acts 93-22 and 93-32. Makes conforming changes concerning those fees and related matters. Effective immediately.
Title
FEE DECREASES
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-26 | Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-02-27 | To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Brady |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=61&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0061.htm |