IL SB0060 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
Pending: Senate Appropriations I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-01-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-01-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-01-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-01-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-01-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-01-16SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-01-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-155Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback