IL SB0059 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall waive all application fees and examination fees for active military personnel and their spouses. Provides that nothing in the provisions waives the requirement that the person or spouse meet all other licensing requirements, including other fees required during the licensing process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR-WAIVE ACTIVE MILITARY FEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2021
2021-03-09SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-02-09SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-63New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback