IL SB0059 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that if an officer or agency submits a Local Records Disposal Certificate to the Local Records Commission and no objection to the Certificate has been received by the Local Records Commission within 30 days after the Local Record Disposal Certificate has been received by the Local Records Commission, then the officer or agency may dispose of the records listed on the Local Records Disposal Certificate without Local Records Commission review or approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL RECORDS-DISPOSAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-09SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
502057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback