IL SB0059 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that if the county board determines it cannot pay jurors the sums of $25 for the first day and thereafter $50 for each day of necessary attendance, then the board shall fix an amount no less than $4 for each day of necessary attendance at courts as jurors in counties of the first class, the sum of $5 for each day in counties of the second class, and the sum of $10 for each day in counties of the third class. Provides that in counties where the county board has determined it cannot pay jurors the sums of $25 for the first day and thereafter $50 for each day of necessary attendance, then the board shall pay jurors such travel expense as may be determined by the county board, provided that the board shall pay jurors in counties of the first class and second class at least 10 cents per mile for travel expense. Provides that the board shall allow mileage for travel during a juror's term as well as for travel at the opening and closing of the juror's term. Makes a corresponding change. Effective June 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY CODE-JUROR FEES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015
2015-03-24SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2015-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-03-18SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2015-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2015-03-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2015-03-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2015-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2015-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2015-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2015-01-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2015-01-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5554-11001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback